MS SC563 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-07 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-07 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution To Adopt Joint Rule No. 41 To Establish Procedures For The Consideration Of Constitutional Initiatives In The Legislature Pursuant To The Requirements Of Section 273 Of The Mississippi Constitution Of 1890; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Joint Rules of the Senate and House; adopt procedure for consideration of constitutional initiatives.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-10 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-07 | Died In Committee | |
2011-02-10 | Referred To Rules | |
2011-02-10 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-02-10 | Immediate Release | |
2011-02-10 | Adopted | |
2011-01-31 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2011-01-17 | Referred To Rules |