MS SC649 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on April 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-14 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on April 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-14 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Mourning The Passing And Commending The Charitable Community Service Of Vietnam Veteran Jerry George Gollott Of Biloxi, Mississippi, And Extending The Condolences Of The Legislature To His Bereaved Family.
Title
Mourn the passing and commend life of Jerry Gollott from Biloxi, Mississippi.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-07 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-01 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-01 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-14 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-07 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2016-04-07 | House | Immediate Release |
2016-04-07 | House | Adopted |
2016-04-05 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2016-04-04 | House | Referred To Rules |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Adopted |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Referred To Rules |