MS SC653 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on April 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-24 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on April 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-24 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing And Saluting Mr. L.b. Mcbride Of Greenwood, Mississippi, On The Occasion Of His 100th Birthday.
Title
Recognize Mr. L.B. McBride on 100th birthday.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-23 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-24 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-04-24 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-04-23 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2012-04-23 | Immediate Release | |
2012-04-23 | Adopted | |
2012-04-20 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2012-04-18 | Referred To Rules | |
2012-04-18 | Transmitted To House | |
2012-04-18 | Immediate Release | |
2012-04-18 | Adopted | |
2012-04-17 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2012-04-11 | Referred To Rules |