MS SC675 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Remembering The Legacy Of Dedicated Public Service Of The Late World War Ii Hero And Mississippi Representative Major General Delos Burks Of Carriere, Mississippi.
Title
Remember legacy of the late World War II hero and Mississippi Representative Major General Delos Burks of Carriere, Mississippi.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-01 - House - House Adopted (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-27 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-27 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-05-01 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2012-05-01 | Immediate Release | |
2012-05-01 | Adopted | |
2012-04-30 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2012-04-27 | Referred To Rules | |
2012-04-27 | Transmitted To House | |
2012-04-27 | Immediate Release | |
2012-04-27 | Adopted | |
2012-04-27 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2012-04-26 | Referred To Rules |