MS SC689 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-04 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-04 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending Lafayette County Assessor/tax Collector Martha H. Thornton For 38 Years Of Dedicated Professional Service On The Occasion Of Her Retirement.
Title
Commend Lafayette County Assessor/Tax Collector Martha H. Thornton for 38 years of public service.
Sponsors
Sen. Kelvin Butler [D] | Sen. Joey Fillingane [R] | Sen. Cindy Hyde-Smith [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] |
Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] | Sen. Gray Tollison [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-31 - House - House Adopted (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-04 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-04-01 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-31 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-03-31 | Immediate Release | |
2011-03-31 | Adopted | |
2011-03-30 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2011-03-30 | Referred To Rules | |
2011-03-30 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-03-30 | Immediate Release | |
2011-03-30 | Adopted | |
2011-03-29 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2011-03-29 | Referred To Rules |