MT HB112 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise importation requirements
Title
Revise importation requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-09 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 62 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 64 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - (H) Agriculture Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 10 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-09 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 62 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 64 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - (H) Agriculture Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 10 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2019-04-01 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2019-03-28 | Senate | (S) Returned to House Not Concurred in Governor's Proposed Amendments |
2019-03-28 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Not Adopted |
2019-03-28 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-03-26 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate for Consideration of Governor's Proposed Amendments |
2019-03-26 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Not Adopted |
2019-03-26 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-03-21 | House | (H) Returned with Governor's Proposed Amendments |
2019-03-19 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2019-03-18 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2019-03-18 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-15 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2019-03-15 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2019-03-13 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2019-03-12 | Senate | (S) Returned to House |
2019-03-12 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2019-03-12 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-03-11 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2019-03-11 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-02-26 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation |
2019-02-26 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation |
2019-02-19 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation |
2019-02-11 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation |
2019-02-11 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2019-02-09 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2019-02-09 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2019-02-09 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-02-08 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2019-02-08 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-02-06 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Agriculture |
2019-02-05 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Agriculture |
2019-01-29 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Agriculture |
2019-01-16 | House | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) Agriculture |
2019-01-07 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Agriculture |
2018-12-19 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Agriculture |
2018-12-14 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2018-12-14 | House | (H) Introduced |
2018-12-05 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2018-12-05 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2018-12-04 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2018-12-04 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2018-12-04 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2018-12-03 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2018-12-03 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK] | |
2018-11-30 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2018-11-29 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2018-11-26 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2018-09-06 | (C) Draft Request Received |