MT HB137 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-19 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-19 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Clarify application of parole eligibility for juvenile offenders
Title
Clarify application of parole eligibility for juvenile offenders
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-08 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-19 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-18 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-19 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-18 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-19 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2013-02-19 | House | (H) Signed by Governor |
2013-02-14 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2013-02-14 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2013-02-13 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-12 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2013-02-11 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2013-02-09 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2013-02-09 | Senate | (S) Returned to House |
2013-02-08 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2013-02-08 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-02-07 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2013-02-07 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-02-05 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Judiciary |
2013-02-05 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Judiciary |
2013-02-05 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Judiciary |
2013-01-30 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary |
2013-01-30 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2013-01-21 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2013-01-19 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2013-01-19 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-01-18 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2013-01-18 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-01-17 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Judiciary |
2013-01-17 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Judiciary |
2013-01-15 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Judiciary |
2013-01-07 | House | (H) First Reading |
2012-12-19 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary |
2012-12-17 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2012-12-17 | House | (H) Introduced |
2012-12-17 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2012-11-19 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2012-11-18 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2012-11-15 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2012-11-14 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2012-11-14 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2012-11-14 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB] | |
2012-11-13 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2012-11-05 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2012-10-16 | (C) Draft Request Received |