MT HB138 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-20 - Chapter Number Assigned  
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-20 - Chapter Number Assigned  
Summary
Revise employment safety and occupational health acts
Title
Revise employment safety and occupational health acts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-20 | Chapter Number Assigned   | |
2009-03-20 | (H) Signed by Governor   | |
2009-03-13 | (H) Transmitted to Governor   | |
2009-03-13 | (S) Signed by President   | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Signed by Speaker   | |
2009-03-11 | (C) Printed - New Version Available   | |
2009-03-11 | (H) Returned from Enrolling   | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Sent to Enrolling   | |
2009-03-09 | (S) Returned to House   | |
2009-03-09 | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred   | |
2009-03-09 | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading   | |
2009-03-07 | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred on Voice Vote   | |
2009-03-07 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading   | |
2009-03-05 | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs | |
2009-03-05 | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs | |
2009-03-05 | (S) Hearing (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs | |
2009-02-23 | (S) First Reading   | |
2009-02-21 | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs | |
2009-01-16 | (H) Transmitted to Senate   | |
2009-01-16 | (H) 3rd Reading Passed   | |
2009-01-16 | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading   | |
2009-01-15 | (C) Printed - New Version Available   | |
2009-01-15 | (H) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended   | |
2009-01-15 | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried   | |
2009-01-15 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading   | |
2009-01-14 | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Business and Labor | |
2009-01-14 | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Business and Labor | |
2009-01-08 | (H) Hearing (H) Business and Labor | |
2009-01-07 | (H) Fiscal Note Printed   | |
2009-01-05 | (H) First Reading   | |
2009-01-05 | (H) Fiscal Note Received   | |
2008-12-23 | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Business and Labor | |
2008-12-22 | (H) Fiscal Note Requested   | |
2008-12-19 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically   | |
2008-12-19 | (H) Introduced   | |
2008-12-18 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent   | |
2008-12-18 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable   | |
2008-12-18 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review   | |
2008-12-18 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review   | |
2008-12-17 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically   | |
2008-12-17 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing   | |
2008-12-17 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB]   | |
2008-12-17 | (C) Draft in Edit   | |
2008-12-15 | (C) Draft in Legal Review   | |
2008-12-09 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review   | |
2008-11-25 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review   | |
2008-10-31 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold   | |
2008-10-07 | (C) Draft On Hold   | |
2008-09-24 | (C) Draft Request Received   |
Subjects
Colleges
Labor and Employment
Local Government
Mining and Minerals
Public Officers and Employees
Revenue, State
Rule Making
Safety
State Government
Labor and Employment
Local Government
Mining and Minerals
Public Officers and Employees
Revenue, State
Rule Making
Safety
State Government
Montana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://laws.leg.mt.gov/laws09/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=138&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=HB&Z_ACTION=Find |