MT HB138 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-27 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-27 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Generally revise Bank Act merger provisions
Title
Generally revise Bank Act merger provisions
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Hertz [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-19 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-27 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2013-02-27 | House | (H) Signed by Governor |
2013-02-23 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2013-02-22 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2013-02-22 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-21 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2013-02-21 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2013-02-20 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2013-02-20 | Senate | (S) Returned to House |
2013-02-19 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2013-02-19 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-02-18 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2013-02-18 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-02-15 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2013-02-15 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2013-02-14 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2013-02-06 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2013-02-06 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2013-01-29 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2013-01-28 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2013-01-28 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-01-25 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-01-25 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended |
2013-01-25 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2013-01-25 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-01-16 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-01-16 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Business and Labor |
2013-01-16 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Business and Labor |
2013-01-11 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Business and Labor |
2013-01-07 | House | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) Business and Labor |
2013-01-07 | House | (H) First Reading |
2012-12-19 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Business and Labor |
2012-12-17 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2012-12-17 | House | (H) Introduced |
2012-11-28 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2012-11-27 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2012-11-27 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2012-11-26 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2012-11-26 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2012-11-26 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2012-11-24 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2012-11-20 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2012-11-09 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2012-06-26 | (C) Draft Request Received |