MT HB138 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-27 - (H) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-27 - (H) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Consider housing needs in discharge plans to the Montana State Hospital
Title
Consider housing needs in discharge plans to the Montana State Hospital
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-01-29 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 92 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - House - (H) Human Services Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - House - (H) Human Services Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-27 | House | (H) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal |
2015-02-05 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Appropriations |
2015-02-04 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2015-01-31 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-01-29 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2015-01-29 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2015-01-29 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2015-01-29 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-01-27 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-01-24 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-01-24 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Human Services |
2015-01-23 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Human Services |
2015-01-12 | House | (H) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Printed (H) Human Services |
2015-01-12 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Human Services |
2015-01-09 | House | (H) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Received (H) Human Services |
2015-01-09 | House | (H) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Signed |
2015-01-07 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed (H) Human Services |
2015-01-06 | House | (H) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Requested (H) Human Services |
2015-01-05 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received (H) Human Services |
2015-01-05 | House | (H) First Reading |
2014-12-23 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Human Services |
2014-12-18 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2014-12-15 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2014-12-15 | House | (H) Introduced |
2014-12-10 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2014-12-09 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2014-12-08 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2014-12-04 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2014-12-04 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2014-12-04 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2014-11-25 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2014-11-25 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2014-11-25 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2014-11-21 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2014-10-29 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2014-04-29 | (C) Draft Request Received |