MT HB216 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Highways and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Highways and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Revise laws related to distribution of overweight and oversize permit fees
Title
Revise laws related to distribution of overweight and oversize permit fees
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Doane [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-27 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | Senate | (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Highways and Transportation |
2013-04-04 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Highways and Transportation |
2013-03-19 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Highways and Transportation |
2013-03-07 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Highways and Transportation |
2013-03-07 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2013-02-27 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2013-02-27 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2013-02-27 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-02-26 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2013-02-26 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-02-21 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-02-21 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Transportation |
2013-02-20 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Transportation |
2013-02-20 | House | (H) Taken from Table in Committee (H) Transportation |
2013-01-29 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Transportation |
2013-01-23 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Transportation |
2013-01-23 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2013-01-23 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2013-01-23 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2013-01-17 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2013-01-16 | House | (H) First Reading |
2013-01-16 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Transportation |
2013-01-15 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2013-01-15 | House | (H) Introduced |
2013-01-14 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2012-12-21 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2012-12-14 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2012-12-13 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2012-12-12 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2012-12-12 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2012-12-12 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2012-12-12 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2012-12-05 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2012-12-05 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2012-11-30 | (C) Draft Request Received |