MT HB301 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Fish and Game
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Fish and Game
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing requirements for use of fishing access sites
Title
Establishing requirements for use of fishing access sites
Sponsors
Rep. Denley Loge [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 77 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 80 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 80 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | Senate | (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Fish and Game |
2019-04-11 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Fish and Game |
2019-04-09 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Fish and Game |
2019-03-26 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Fish and Game |
2019-03-26 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2019-03-25 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2019-03-25 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2019-03-25 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-03-25 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2019-03-23 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Signed |
2019-03-23 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2019-03-22 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations |
2019-03-22 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations |
2019-03-22 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2019-03-22 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Signed |
2019-03-22 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2019-03-22 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2019-03-22 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2019-03-21 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2019-03-21 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2019-03-18 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-03-18 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2019-03-18 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended |
2019-03-18 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2019-03-18 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-03-18 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2019-03-15 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-03-15 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks |
2019-03-14 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks |
2019-02-26 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks |
2019-02-04 | House | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks |
2019-02-01 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2019-02-01 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2019-01-31 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2019-01-26 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2019-01-25 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks |
2019-01-25 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks |
2019-01-25 | House | (H) Introduced |
2019-01-25 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2019-01-24 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2019-01-22 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2019-01-22 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2019-01-22 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2019-01-22 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2019-01-22 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2019-01-22 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2019-01-22 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH] | |
2019-01-21 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2019-01-21 | (C) Draft Back for Redo | |
2019-01-21 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2019-01-21 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2019-01-18 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2019-01-18 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH] | |
2019-01-18 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2019-01-17 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2019-01-07 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2018-12-22 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2018-12-22 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2018-12-13 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2018-12-03 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2018-11-16 | (C) Draft Request Received |