MT HB394 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Highways and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Highways and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise bicycle safety laws
Title
Revise bicycle safety laws
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 52 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 52 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - (H) Transportation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 52 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - (H) Transportation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | Senate | (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Highways and Transportation |
2015-03-19 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Highways and Transportation |
2015-03-10 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Highways and Transportation |
2015-03-05 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Highways and Transportation |
2015-03-05 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2015-02-25 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2015-02-24 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2015-02-24 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-02-23 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2015-02-23 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-02-21 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Transportation |
2015-02-20 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Transportation |
2015-02-20 | House | (H) Taken from Table in Committee (H) Transportation |
2015-02-13 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Transportation |
2015-02-11 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Transportation |
2015-02-04 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2015-02-04 | House | (H) First Reading |
2015-02-04 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Transportation |
2015-02-04 | House | (H) Introduced |
2015-02-02 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2015-01-15 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2015-01-14 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2015-01-14 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2015-01-14 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2015-01-14 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK] | |
2015-01-13 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2015-01-10 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2014-12-23 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2014-12-05 | (C) Draft Request Received |