MT HB424 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-22 - (H) Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-22 - (H) Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Generally revise sustainability of state finance and provide for transfers
Title
Generally revise sustainability of state finance and provide for transfers
Sponsors
Rep. Llew Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-02 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate (Y: 87 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred (Y: 82 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 34 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-31 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred (Y: 82 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 34 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-31 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-22 | House | (H) Signed by Governor |
2023-05-22 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2023-05-12 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2023-05-11 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2023-05-11 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2023-05-11 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2023-05-11 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2023-05-03 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2023-05-02 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate |
2023-05-02 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred |
2023-05-02 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2023-05-02 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2023-04-30 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2023-04-27 | Senate | (S) Returned to House with Amendments |
2023-04-27 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2023-04-27 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2023-04-27 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Signed |
2023-04-27 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2023-04-26 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2023-04-26 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended |
2023-04-26 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2023-04-26 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2023-04-25 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Finance and Claims |
2023-04-25 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2023-04-21 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Finance and Claims |
2023-04-18 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2023-04-11 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2023-04-07 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Signed |
2023-04-06 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2023-04-04 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2023-04-04 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2023-04-04 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2023-04-03 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2023-03-31 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2023-03-31 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2023-03-28 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2023-03-28 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Appropriations |
2023-03-27 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Appropriations |
2023-03-26 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2023-02-14 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2023-02-13 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2023-02-13 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2023-02-10 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2023-02-07 | House | (H) First Reading |
2023-02-07 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2023-02-06 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2023-02-06 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2023-02-06 | House | (H) Introduced |
2023-02-06 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2023-02-06 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2023-02-02 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-02-01 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2023-02-01 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-02-01 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2023-02-01 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2023-02-01 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2023-02-01 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2023-01-31 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2023-01-31 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review | |
2023-01-27 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2023-01-25 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2023-01-20 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2023-01-20 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2022-11-10 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2022-07-26 | (C) Draft Request Received |
Subjects
Appropriations
Bond Issues, Public
Colleges
Emergency and Disaster Services
Fires and Fire Protection
Health Care Services
Money Transfer
State Finance
Bond Issues, Public
Colleges
Emergency and Disaster Services
Fires and Fire Protection
Health Care Services
Money Transfer
State Finance