MT HB473 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-06 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-06 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise medical lien laws
Title
Revise medical lien laws
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-24 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 26 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-20 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 59 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 55 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-06 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 60 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 61 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-20 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 59 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 55 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-06 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 60 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 61 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-06 | House | (H) Died in Process |
2013-05-06 | House | (H) Vetoed by Governor |
2013-04-26 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2013-04-25 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2013-04-25 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2013-04-25 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2013-04-25 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2013-04-24 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2013-04-24 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-04-24 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2013-04-24 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-04-23 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2013-04-23 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-04-20 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2013-04-20 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-04-19 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2013-04-19 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-04-18 | Senate | (S) Conference Committee Report Received |
2013-04-18 | House | (H) Conference Committee Report Received |
2013-04-17 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Conference |
2013-04-12 | Senate | (S) Conference Committee Appointed |
2013-04-10 | House | (H) Conference Committee Appointed |
2013-04-10 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Not Concurred |
2013-04-10 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-04-08 | Senate | (S) Returned to House with Amendments |
2013-04-08 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2013-04-08 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-04-06 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2013-04-06 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-04-03 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-04-03 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2013-04-02 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2013-04-02 | Senate | (S) Taken from Table in Committee (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2013-04-02 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2013-03-18 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2013-03-08 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2013-03-08 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2013-02-27 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2013-02-27 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2013-02-27 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-02-26 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2013-02-26 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-02-23 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-02-23 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Business and Labor |
2013-02-23 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2013-02-23 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2013-02-23 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2013-02-21 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Business and Labor |
2013-02-19 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2013-02-19 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Business and Labor |
2013-02-14 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Business and Labor |
2013-02-14 | House | (H) First Reading |
2013-02-13 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2013-02-13 | House | (H) Introduced |
2013-02-13 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2013-02-11 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2013-02-11 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2013-02-11 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2013-02-11 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2013-02-11 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2013-02-09 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2013-02-08 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2013-02-08 | (C) Draft Back for Redo | |
2013-02-07 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2013-02-07 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2013-01-29 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2012-11-20 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2012-11-07 | (C) Draft Request Received |