MT HB486 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise laws related to mopeds
Title
Revise laws related to mopeds
Sponsors
Rep. Rob Cook [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-21 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - Senate - (S) Highways and Transportation Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 87 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 93 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - (H) Transportation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - Senate - (S) Highways and Transportation Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 87 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 93 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - (H) Transportation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2015-04-30 | House | (H) Signed by Governor |
2015-04-24 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2015-04-24 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2015-04-23 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-22 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2015-04-22 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2015-04-21 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2015-04-21 | Senate | (S) Returned to House |
2015-04-21 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2015-04-21 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-04-20 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2015-04-20 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-04-17 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Highways and Transportation |
2015-04-16 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Highways and Transportation |
2015-03-19 | Senate | (S) Committee Vote Failed; Remains in Committee (S) Highways and Transportation |
2015-03-10 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Highways and Transportation |
2015-03-06 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Highways and Transportation |
2015-03-06 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2015-02-27 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2015-02-26 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2015-02-26 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-02-25 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2015-02-25 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-02-23 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Transportation |
2015-02-23 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-02-20 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Transportation |
2015-02-16 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Transportation |
2015-02-12 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2015-02-12 | House | (H) First Reading |
2015-02-12 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Transportation |
2015-02-12 | House | (H) Introduced |
2015-02-12 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2015-02-11 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2015-02-11 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2015-02-11 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2015-02-11 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2015-02-11 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2015-02-09 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2015-02-06 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2015-02-04 | (C) Draft Request Received |