MT HB562 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-15 - (S) Motion Failed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-15 - (S) Motion Failed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Require agency reporting on financial assistance to tribes
Title
Require agency reporting on financial assistance to tribes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-11 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postponed (Y: 32 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-11 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concur Motion Failed (Y: 19 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-04-08 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - (S) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 58 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 59 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - (H) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-11 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concur Motion Failed (Y: 19 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-04-08 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - (S) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 58 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 59 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - (H) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Senate | (S) Motion Failed |
2015-04-11 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postponed |
2015-04-11 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concur Motion Failed |
2015-04-11 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-04-08 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-04-08 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-04-08 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-04-07 | Senate | (S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-03-27 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-03-26 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-03-26 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) State Administration |
2015-03-26 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-03-25 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) State Administration |
2015-03-20 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) State Administration |
2015-03-06 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) State Administration |
2015-03-06 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2015-02-27 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2015-02-26 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2015-02-26 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-02-25 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations |
2015-02-25 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations |
2015-02-25 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2015-02-25 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2015-02-25 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2015-02-25 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-02-24 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-02-24 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) State Administration |
2015-02-24 | (C) Sponsors Engrossed | |
2015-02-24 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-02-24 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2015-02-24 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2015-02-23 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) State Administration |
2015-02-23 | House | (H) Hearing (H) State Administration |
2015-02-19 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2015-02-18 | House | (H) First Reading |
2015-02-18 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) State Administration |
2015-02-18 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-02-18 | House | (H) Introduced |
2015-02-16 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2015-02-16 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2015-02-16 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2015-02-16 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2015-02-16 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2015-02-16 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2015-02-16 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2015-02-13 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH] | |
2015-02-13 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2015-02-13 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2015-01-17 | (C) Draft Request Received |