MT HB591 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-30 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-30 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Increase the fees for licensing of commodity weighing devices
Title
Increase the fees for licensing of commodity weighing devices
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-17 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 82 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 80 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 82 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 80 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-30 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2013-04-30 | House | (H) Signed by Governor |
2013-04-25 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2013-04-25 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2013-04-19 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2013-04-19 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2013-04-19 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2013-04-19 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2013-04-18 | Senate | (S) Returned to House |
2013-04-17 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2013-04-17 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-04-16 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2013-04-16 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-04-12 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation |
2013-04-11 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation |
2013-04-11 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation |
2013-04-06 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation |
2013-04-06 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2013-04-04 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2013-04-03 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2013-04-03 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-04-02 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2013-04-02 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-03-27 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations |
2013-03-27 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations |
2013-03-25 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2013-03-21 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2013-03-21 | House | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) Business and Labor |
2013-03-19 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2013-03-18 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2013-03-18 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2013-03-14 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2013-03-13 | House | (H) First Reading |
2013-03-13 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Business and Labor |
2013-03-13 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2013-03-13 | House | (H) Introduced |
2013-03-13 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2013-02-20 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2013-02-20 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2013-02-20 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2013-02-20 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2013-02-19 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2013-02-19 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2013-02-19 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2013-02-19 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2013-02-18 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2013-02-18 | (C) Draft Request Received |