MT HB614 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-30 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-30 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for limited lines travel insurance
Title
Provide for limited lines travel insurance
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Berry [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-17 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 87 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 85 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 87 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 85 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-30 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2013-04-30 | House | (H) Signed by Governor |
2013-04-25 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2013-04-25 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2013-04-19 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2013-04-19 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2013-04-19 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2013-04-19 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2013-04-18 | Senate | (S) Returned to House |
2013-04-17 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2013-04-17 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-04-16 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-04-16 | (C) Sponsors Engrossed | |
2013-04-16 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2013-04-16 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-04-15 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2013-04-12 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2013-04-06 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2013-04-06 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2013-04-04 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2013-04-03 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2013-04-03 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-04-02 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2013-04-02 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-03-28 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Pass Consideration |
2013-03-28 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-03-27 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Business and Labor |
2013-03-27 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Business and Labor |
2013-03-27 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Business and Labor |
2013-03-26 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2013-03-26 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2013-03-26 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2013-03-21 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2013-03-20 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Business and Labor |
2013-03-20 | House | (H) First Reading |
2013-03-20 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2013-03-20 | House | (H) Introduced |
2013-03-20 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2013-03-19 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2013-03-19 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2013-03-18 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2013-03-18 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2013-03-18 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2013-03-18 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN] | |
2013-03-16 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2013-03-14 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2013-02-14 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2013-02-14 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2012-12-07 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2012-12-05 | (C) Draft Request Received |