MT HB633 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-09 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-09 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise healthy Montana kids program
Title
Revise healthy Montana kids program
Sponsors
Sen. John Esp [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-18 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 26 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Senate - (S) Reconsidered Previous Action; Remains in 3rd Reading Process (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Failed (Y: 24 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-12 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 26 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 52 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 57 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Senate - (S) Reconsidered Previous Action; Remains in 3rd Reading Process (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Failed (Y: 24 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-12 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 26 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 52 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 57 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-09 | (H) Died in Process | |
2011-05-09 | (H) Vetoed by Governor | |
2011-05-02 | (H) Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-29 | (S) Signed by President | |
2011-04-21 | (H) Signed by Speaker | |
2011-04-20 | (H) Returned from Enrolling | |
2011-04-19 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Sent to Enrolling | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Returned to House | |
2011-04-18 | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading | |
2011-04-13 | (S) Reconsidered Previous Action; Remains in 3rd Reading Process | |
2011-04-13 | (S) 3rd Reading Failed | |
2011-04-13 | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading | |
2011-04-12 | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-04-07 | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Finance and Claims | |
2011-04-07 | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Finance and Claims | |
2011-04-02 | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims | |
2011-03-31 | (S) Hearing Canceled (S) Finance and Claims | |
2011-03-30 | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims | |
2011-03-30 | (S) First Reading | |
2011-03-29 | (H) Transmitted to Senate | |
2011-03-29 | (H) 3rd Reading Passed | |
2011-03-29 | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading | |
2011-03-28 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2011-03-28 | (H) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended | |
2011-03-28 | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried | |
2011-03-28 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-03-26 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-03-23 | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations | |
2011-03-23 | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations | |
2011-03-23 | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations | |
2011-03-22 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2011-03-22 | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Appropriations | |
2011-03-22 | (H) First Reading | |
2011-03-22 | (H) Introduced | |
2011-03-22 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2011-03-22 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2011-03-21 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2011-03-21 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2011-03-21 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2011-03-21 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2011-03-21 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2011-03-21 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2011-03-21 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2011-03-18 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2011-02-11 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2011-02-10 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2011-02-08 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2011-02-08 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2010-12-28 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2010-12-05 | (C) Draft Request Received |