MT HJ22 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-20 - (H) Filed with Secretary of State  
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-20 - (H) Filed with Secretary of State  
Summary
Recognition of anniversaries for Russell and Rankin statues in Statuary Hall
Title
Recognition of anniversaries for Russell and Rankin statues in Statuary Hall
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-20 | (H) Filed with Secretary of State   | |
2009-03-19 | (S) Signed by President   | |
2009-03-19 | (H) Signed by Speaker   | |
2009-03-19 | (H) Returned from Enrolling   | |
2009-03-18 | (C) Printed - New Version Available   | |
2009-03-18 | (H) Sent to Enrolling   | |
2009-03-18 | (S) Returned to House   | |
2009-03-18 | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred   | |
2009-03-18 | (S) On Motion Rules Suspended   | |
2009-03-18 | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred on Voice Vote   | |
2009-03-18 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading   | |
2009-03-07 | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) State Administration | |
2009-03-07 | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) State Administration | |
2009-03-06 | (S) Hearing (S) State Administration | |
2009-03-02 | (S) Referred to Committee (S) State Administration | |
2009-03-02 | (S) First Reading   | |
2009-02-24 | (H) Transmitted to Senate   | |
2009-02-23 | (H) 3rd Reading Passed   | |
2009-02-23 | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading   | |
2009-02-21 | (H) 2nd Reading Passed   | |
2009-02-21 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading   | |
2009-02-19 | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) State Administration | |
2009-02-19 | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) State Administration | |
2009-02-19 | (H) Hearing (H) State Administration | |
2009-02-11 | (H) First Reading   | |
2009-02-11 | (H) Referred to Committee (H) State Administration | |
2009-02-10 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically   | |
2009-02-10 | (H) Introduced   | |
2009-02-09 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester   | |
2009-02-03 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery   | |
2009-02-02 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review   | |
2009-02-02 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review   | |
2009-02-02 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically   | |
2009-02-02 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing   | |
2009-02-02 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN]   | |
2009-02-02 | (C) Draft in Edit   | |
2009-02-02 | (C) Draft in Legal Review   | |
2009-02-02 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold   | |
2009-01-08 | (C) Draft On Hold   | |
2009-01-02 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review   | |
2008-12-23 | (C) Draft Request Received   |
Subjects
Montana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://laws.leg.mt.gov/laws09/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=22&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=HJ&Z_ACTION=Find |