MT HJ35 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Study resolution to examine recordkeeping for legislative session proceedings
Title
Study resolution to examine recordkeeping for legislative session proceedings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-13 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Not Passed (Y: 45 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | (H) Died in Process | |
2011-04-20 | (H) Missed Deadline for Interim Study Resolution Transmittal | |
2011-04-13 | (H) 2nd Reading Not Passed | |
2011-04-13 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) State Administration | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) State Administration | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Hearing (H) State Administration | |
2011-04-07 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2011-04-06 | (H) Referred to Committee (H) State Administration | |
2011-04-06 | (H) First Reading | |
2011-04-06 | (H) Introduced | |
2011-04-06 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2011-04-05 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2011-04-05 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2011-04-05 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2011-04-05 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2011-04-05 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2011-04-05 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB] | |
2011-04-05 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2011-04-05 | (C) Draft Back for Redo | |
2011-04-05 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2011-04-04 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2011-03-08 | (C) Draft Request Received |