MT HJ39 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - (H) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - (H) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study on healthcare and health insurance costs
Title
Interim study on healthcare and health insurance costs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-22 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 55 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-21 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 54 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - (H) Business and Labor Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-21 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 54 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - (H) Business and Labor Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-28 | House | (H) Died in Standing Committee |
2017-04-24 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2017-04-24 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2017-04-22 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2017-04-22 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2017-04-22 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-04-21 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2017-04-21 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-04-20 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-04-20 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Business and Labor |
2017-04-20 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Business and Labor |
2017-04-19 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Business and Labor |
2017-04-11 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2017-04-11 | House | (H) First Reading |
2017-04-11 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Business and Labor |
2017-04-11 | House | (H) Introduced |
2017-04-11 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2017-04-10 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2017-04-10 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2017-04-10 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2017-04-10 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2017-04-10 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2017-04-10 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2017-04-07 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2017-04-07 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK] | |
2017-04-07 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2017-04-07 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2017-03-30 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2017-03-30 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2016-12-02 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2016-12-01 | (C) Draft Request Received |