MT HR2 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - (H) Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - (H) Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution recognizing the service of 75 years of smoke jumpers
Title
Resolution recognizing the service of 75 years of smoke jumpers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-13 - House - (H) Resolution Adopted (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - (H) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Resolution Adopted (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - (H) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Resolution Adopted (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | House | (H) Filed with Secretary of State |
2015-04-14 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-14 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2015-04-14 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2015-04-13 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2015-04-13 | House | (H) Resolution Adopted |
2015-04-13 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-04-11 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-02-19 | House | (H) Committee Report--Resolution Adopted (H) Natural Resources |
2015-02-18 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Resolution Adopted (H) Natural Resources |
2015-02-16 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Natural Resources |
2015-02-10 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2015-02-10 | House | (H) First Reading |
2015-02-10 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Natural Resources |
2015-02-10 | House | (H) Introduced |
2015-02-09 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2015-02-07 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2015-02-07 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2015-02-06 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2015-02-06 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2015-02-06 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2015-02-05 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2015-02-02 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2015-02-02 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2015-01-10 | (C) Draft Request Received |