MT HR4 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-15 - (H) Bill Withdrawn per House Rule H30-50(3)(b)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-15 - (H) Bill Withdrawn per House Rule H30-50(3)(b)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House resolution for MT historical society repository for original 13th Amend
Title
House resolution for MT historical society repository for original 13th Amend
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Read [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-15 | House | (H) Bill Withdrawn per House Rule H30-50(3)(b) |
2023-03-14 | House | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) Energy, Technology and Federal Relations |
2023-02-22 | House | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) Energy, Technology and Federal Relations |
2023-02-22 | House | (H) First Reading |
2023-02-22 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Energy, Technology and Federal Relations |
2023-02-21 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2023-02-21 | House | (H) Introduced |
2023-02-21 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2023-02-18 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-02-17 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2023-02-17 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-02-17 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2023-02-17 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2023-02-16 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2023-02-16 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2023-02-16 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2023-02-15 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review | |
2023-02-09 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2023-02-09 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2023-01-26 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2022-12-11 | (C) Draft Request Received |
Subjects
Montana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=4&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=HR&Z_ACTION=Find&P_SESS=20231 |
Text | https://leg.mt.gov/bills/2023/HouRes/HR0004_1.pdf |