MT SB11 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increase minimum corporate income tax
Title
Increase minimum corporate income tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-20 - Senate - (S) Rereferred to Committee (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - (S) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - (S) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Senate | (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Taxation |
2021-04-08 | Senate | (S) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal |
2021-01-29 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Taxation |
2021-01-20 | Senate | (S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Taxation |
2021-01-19 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Taxation |
2021-01-19 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Taxation |
2021-01-13 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Taxation |
2021-01-12 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2021-01-11 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2021-01-04 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2020-12-23 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2020-12-23 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Taxation |
2020-12-11 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2020-12-11 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2020-11-30 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2020-11-30 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2020-11-27 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2020-11-27 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2020-11-17 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2020-10-28 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2020-10-13 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2020-09-11 | (C) Draft Request Received |