MT SB118 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Setting aside special license for residents 65 and older
Title
Setting aside special license for residents 65 and older
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Thomas [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-18 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-16 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 28 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-16 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 28 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | House | (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks |
2013-03-08 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks |
2013-03-05 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks |
2013-02-26 | House | (H) First Reading |
2013-02-26 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks |
2013-02-19 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2013-02-18 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2013-02-18 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-02-16 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2013-02-16 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-02-12 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed Consideration |
2013-02-12 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-02-08 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-02-08 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Fish and Game |
2013-02-07 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Fish and Game |
2013-01-17 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Fish and Game |
2013-01-16 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2013-01-15 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Signed |
2013-01-15 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2013-01-14 | Senate | (S) Hearing Canceled (S) Fish and Game |
2013-01-10 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2013-01-10 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Fish and Game |
2013-01-09 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2013-01-09 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2013-01-09 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2013-01-08 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2013-01-08 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2013-01-04 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2013-01-04 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2013-01-04 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2013-01-02 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2013-01-02 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2013-01-02 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2013-01-02 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2012-12-31 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2012-12-31 | (C) Draft Back for Requester Changes | |
2012-12-17 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2012-12-17 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2012-12-13 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2012-12-04 | (C) Draft Request Received |