MT SB174 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Business and Labor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Business and Labor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize alternatives for state agency worker's compensation coverage
Title
Authorize alternatives for state agency worker's compensation coverage
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Keane [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-11 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 40 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-09 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-09 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | House | (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Business and Labor |
2013-04-04 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Business and Labor |
2013-04-03 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Business and Labor |
2013-02-27 | House | (H) First Reading |
2013-02-27 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Business and Labor |
2013-02-12 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2013-02-11 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2013-02-11 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-02-09 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2013-02-09 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-02-06 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2013-02-06 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2013-02-06 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2013-02-05 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Signed |
2013-02-05 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2013-01-31 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2013-01-29 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2013-01-23 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2013-01-23 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2013-01-22 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2013-01-22 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2013-01-21 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2013-01-19 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2013-01-18 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2013-01-18 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2013-01-17 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2013-01-17 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2013-01-17 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB] | |
2013-01-16 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2013-01-05 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2013-01-05 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2012-11-17 | (C) Draft Request Received |