MT SB191 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise school tuition and levy laws related to special needs students
Title
Revise school tuition and levy laws related to special needs students
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-12 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 92 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 92 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 92 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-25 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2013-04-25 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2013-04-18 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2013-04-18 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2013-04-17 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2013-04-16 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2013-04-15 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2013-04-13 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2013-04-13 | House | (H) Returned to Senate |
2013-04-12 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2013-04-12 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-04-11 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-04-11 | (C) Sponsors Engrossed | |
2013-04-11 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2013-04-11 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-03-23 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Education |
2013-03-22 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Education |
2013-03-15 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Education |
2013-03-09 | House | (H) First Reading |
2013-03-08 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Education |
2013-03-08 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2013-03-07 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2013-03-07 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-03-06 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2013-03-06 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-02-18 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2013-02-15 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2013-02-01 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2013-02-01 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2013-02-01 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Signed |
2013-02-01 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2013-01-29 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2013-01-24 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2013-01-24 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2013-01-24 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2013-01-23 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2013-01-21 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2013-01-17 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2013-01-16 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2013-01-16 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2013-01-16 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2013-01-15 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2013-01-15 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2013-01-15 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB] | |
2013-01-15 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2013-01-14 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2013-01-07 | (C) Draft Request Received |