MT SB208 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide tax credit for student loan payments
Title
Provide tax credit for student loan payments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | Senate | (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Taxation |
2019-04-01 | Senate | (S) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal |
2019-02-15 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Taxation |
2019-02-13 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Taxation |
2019-02-12 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2019-02-11 | (C) Fiscal Note Unsigned | |
2019-02-11 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2019-02-05 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Taxation |
2019-02-05 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2019-02-04 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2019-02-04 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2019-02-04 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2019-02-04 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2019-01-15 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2019-01-15 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2019-01-15 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2019-01-15 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2019-01-15 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2019-01-15 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2019-01-14 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2019-01-14 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK] | |
2019-01-12 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2019-01-11 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2018-12-30 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2018-12-12 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2018-12-12 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2018-11-14 | (C) Draft Request Received |
Subjects
Colleges
Revenue, State
Rule Making
Taxation (Generally)
Taxation--Corporations
Taxation--Individual Income
University System
Revenue, State
Rule Making
Taxation (Generally)
Taxation--Corporations
Taxation--Individual Income
University System
Montana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=208&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=SB&Z_ACTION=Find&P_SESS=20191 |
Text | https://leg.mt.gov/bills/2019/SB0299/SB0208_1.pdf |