MT SB239 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Uniform Directed Trust Act
Title
Uniform Directed Trust Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 94 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 96 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - (H) Business and Labor Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 96 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - (H) Business and Labor Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2021-04-30 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2021-04-23 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2021-04-23 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-22 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2021-04-14 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2021-04-14 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2021-04-13 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2021-04-12 | House | (H) Returned to Senate |
2021-04-12 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2021-04-12 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-04-09 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2021-04-09 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-03-19 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Business and Labor |
2021-03-19 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Business and Labor |
2021-03-17 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Business and Labor |
2021-03-10 | House | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) Business and Labor |
2021-03-08 | House | (H) First Reading |
2021-03-02 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Business and Labor |
2021-03-02 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2021-03-02 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2021-03-01 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-03-01 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2021-03-01 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended |
2021-03-01 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2021-03-01 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-02-23 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2021-02-19 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2021-02-15 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2021-02-15 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2021-02-12 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2021-02-12 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2021-02-12 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2021-01-20 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-01-20 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2021-01-20 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-01-20 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2021-01-20 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2021-01-20 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2021-01-20 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2021-01-19 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2021-01-19 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2021-01-14 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2021-01-13 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2021-01-12 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2021-01-11 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2020-10-15 | (C) Draft Request Received |