MT SB275 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-18 - (H) 3rd Reading Failed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-18 - (H) 3rd Reading Failed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment to elect board of public education
Title
Constitutional amendment to elect board of public education
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Webb [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-17 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 57 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - (H) Education Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - (S) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - (H) Education Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - (S) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-18 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Failed |
2015-04-18 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-04-17 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2015-04-17 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-04-08 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Education |
2015-04-08 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Education |
2015-03-30 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Education |
2015-03-26 | House | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) Education |
2015-03-19 | House | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) Education |
2015-03-18 | House | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) Education |
2015-03-12 | House | (H) First Reading |
2015-03-12 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Education |
2015-03-10 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2015-03-10 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Failed; 2nd House Vote Required |
2015-03-10 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-03-09 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Pass Motion Failed; 3rd Reading Vote Required |
2015-03-09 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-03-06 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed Consideration |
2015-03-06 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-02-17 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-02-17 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) State Administration |
2015-02-16 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) State Administration |
2015-02-13 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) State Administration |
2015-02-13 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-02-12 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Signed |
2015-02-12 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2015-02-06 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) State Administration |
2015-02-06 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2015-02-05 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2015-02-05 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-02-05 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2015-02-03 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2015-02-03 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2015-02-03 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2015-02-03 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2015-02-02 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2015-02-02 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2015-02-02 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2015-02-02 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2015-01-17 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2015-01-05 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2015-01-05 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2014-12-05 | (C) Draft Request Received |