MT SB307 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - (S) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - (S) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise utility rate laws related state and local taxes
Title
Revise utility rate laws related state and local taxes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-27 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Failed (Y: 23 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-26 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | Senate | (S) Died in Process |
2013-02-28 | Senate | (S) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal |
2013-02-27 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Failed |
2013-02-27 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-02-26 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2013-02-26 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-02-25 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Taxation |
2013-02-25 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Taxation |
2013-02-21 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2013-02-21 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Signed |
2013-02-21 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2013-02-21 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Taxation |
2013-02-15 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2013-02-13 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2013-02-13 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Taxation |
2013-02-13 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2013-02-13 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2013-02-11 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2013-01-29 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2013-01-28 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2013-01-28 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2013-01-28 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2013-01-28 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2013-01-28 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2013-01-26 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB] | |
2013-01-25 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2013-01-25 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2013-01-23 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2013-01-18 | (C) Draft Request Received |