MT SB329 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Natural Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Natural Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Limit liability for aviation on state lands
Title
Limit liability for aviation on state lands
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - (S) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - (S) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Natural Resources |
2015-04-01 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Natural Resources |
2015-03-30 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Natural Resources |
2015-02-27 | House | (H) First Reading |
2015-02-26 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Natural Resources |
2015-02-25 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2015-02-25 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2015-02-25 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-02-24 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2015-02-24 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-02-21 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-02-21 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Natural Resources |
2015-02-20 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Natural Resources |
2015-02-18 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Natural Resources |
2015-02-14 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Natural Resources |
2015-02-14 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2015-02-13 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2015-02-13 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2015-02-13 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2015-02-13 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2015-02-12 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2015-02-12 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2015-02-12 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2015-02-12 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2015-02-12 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK] | |
2015-02-11 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2015-02-10 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2015-01-28 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2015-01-16 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2015-01-15 | (C) Draft Request Received |