MT SB329 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-13 - (S) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-13 - (S) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for a statutory adjustment to nursing home reimbursement rates
Title
Provide for a statutory adjustment to nursing home reimbursement rates
Sponsors
Sen. Dennis Lenz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-13 | Senate | (S) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal |
2023-02-22 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2023-02-21 | (C) Fiscal Note Unsigned | |
2023-02-20 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2023-02-20 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2023-02-20 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2023-02-15 | Senate | (S) Bill Not Heard at Sponsor's Request (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2023-02-14 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2023-02-14 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2023-02-14 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2023-02-13 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2023-02-13 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2023-02-13 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2023-02-13 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-02-11 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2023-02-11 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-02-11 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2023-02-11 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2023-02-10 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2023-02-10 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2023-02-10 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2023-02-10 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review | |
2023-02-08 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2023-02-08 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2023-02-06 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2022-11-07 | (C) Draft Request Received |