MT SB386 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revising late file penalty, filing, and withholding for pass-through entities
Title
Revising late file penalty, filing, and withholding for pass-through entities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-18 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 95 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-17 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 91 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - House - (H) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - (S) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-17 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 91 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - House - (H) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - (S) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-04 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2015-05-04 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2015-04-25 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2015-04-24 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-22 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2015-04-20 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2015-04-20 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2015-04-20 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2015-04-18 | House | (H) Returned to Senate |
2015-04-18 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2015-04-18 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-04-17 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Appropriations |
2015-04-17 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Appropriations |
2015-04-17 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2015-04-16 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2015-04-16 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2015-04-16 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-04-09 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Taxation |
2015-04-09 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Taxation |
2015-04-09 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Taxation |
2015-04-01 | House | (H) First Reading |
2015-03-31 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Taxation |
2015-03-31 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2015-03-31 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2015-03-31 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-03-30 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2015-03-30 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-03-28 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-03-27 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-03-27 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-03-26 | Senate | (S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-03-25 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-03-25 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Taxation |
2015-03-25 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Taxation |
2015-03-10 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Taxation |
2015-03-05 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-02-26 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Signed |
2015-02-26 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2015-02-20 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2015-02-20 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-02-20 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Taxation |
2015-02-20 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2015-02-20 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2015-02-19 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2015-02-18 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2015-02-18 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2015-02-18 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2015-02-18 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2015-02-18 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2015-02-18 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK] | |
2015-02-16 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2015-02-14 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2015-02-14 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2015-01-30 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2014-12-29 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2014-12-05 | (C) Draft Request Received |