MT SB390 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-13 - (S) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-13 - (S) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide freedom in school choice
Title
Provide freedom in school choice
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-28 - Senate - (S) Motion Failed (Y: 21 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-13 | Senate | (S) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal |
2023-02-28 | Senate | (S) Motion Failed |
2023-02-27 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2023-02-27 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2023-02-24 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2023-02-24 | (C) Fiscal Note Unsigned | |
2023-02-24 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2023-02-24 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2023-02-20 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2023-02-17 | (C) Legal Review Note | |
2023-02-17 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2023-02-17 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2023-02-17 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2023-02-17 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2023-02-17 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2023-02-17 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2023-02-16 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-02-15 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2023-02-15 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-02-15 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2023-02-10 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2023-02-09 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2023-02-09 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2023-02-09 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2023-02-08 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review | |
2023-02-08 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2023-01-25 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2022-12-03 | (C) Draft Request Received |