MT SB4 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - (S) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - (S) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide immunity from civil liability for sports officials
Title
Provide immunity from civil liability for sports officials
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Lewis [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-01-19 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 30 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | (S) Died in Standing Committee | |
2011-03-03 | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Judiciary | |
2011-03-02 | (H) Hearing (H) Judiciary | |
2011-02-01 | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary | |
2011-02-01 | (H) First Reading | |
2011-01-19 | (S) Transmitted to House | |
2011-01-19 | (S) 3rd Reading Passed | |
2011-01-19 | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading | |
2011-01-18 | (S) 2nd Reading Passed | |
2011-01-18 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-01-14 | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Judiciary | |
2011-01-14 | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Judiciary | |
2011-01-14 | (S) Hearing (S) Judiciary | |
2011-01-03 | (S) First Reading | |
2010-12-14 | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary | |
2010-11-15 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2010-11-15 | (S) Introduced | |
2010-11-09 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2010-11-08 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2010-11-08 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2010-11-04 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2010-11-04 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2010-11-04 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN] | |
2010-09-21 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2010-09-15 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2010-09-10 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2010-07-15 | (C) Draft Request Received |