MT SB403 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - (S) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - (S) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Generally revise K-12 school funding
Title
Generally revise K-12 school funding
Sponsors
Rep. Llew Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-24 - Senate - (S) Rereferred to Committee (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - Senate - (S) Reconsidered Previous Action; Remains in 3rd Reading Process (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Failed (Y: 25 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-22 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 25 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - Senate - (S) Reconsidered Previous Action; Remains in 3rd Reading Process (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Failed (Y: 25 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-22 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 25 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | (S) Died in Standing Committee | |
2011-03-30 | (S) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal | |
2011-03-24 | (S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims | |
2011-03-24 | (S) Reconsidered Previous Action; Remains in 3rd Reading Process | |
2011-03-23 | (S) 3rd Reading Failed | |
2011-03-23 | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading | |
2011-03-22 | (S) 2nd Reading Passed | |
2011-03-22 | (S) Motion Failed | |
2011-03-22 | (S) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Printed | |
2011-03-22 | (S) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Received | |
2011-03-22 | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed | |
2011-03-22 | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Received | |
2011-03-22 | (S) Fiscal Note Printed | |
2011-03-22 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-03-21 | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Education and Cultural Resources | |
2011-03-21 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2011-03-18 | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Education and Cultural Resources | |
2011-03-18 | (S) Fiscal Note Received | |
2011-03-14 | (S) Hearing (S) Education and Cultural Resources | |
2011-03-14 | (S) Sponsor List Modified | |
2011-03-11 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Education and Cultural Resources | |
2011-03-10 | (S) First Reading | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Fiscal Note Requested | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Introduced | |
2011-03-10 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2011-03-10 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2011-03-10 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2011-03-10 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2011-03-10 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2011-03-10 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2011-03-10 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2011-03-08 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2011-03-08 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2011-02-10 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2010-10-18 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2010-10-15 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2010-10-15 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2010-10-15 | (C) Draft Request Received |