MT SB43 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Generally revise laws governing the long-range building program
Title
Generally revise laws governing the long-range building program
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Sesso [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-06 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 68 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 65 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - (H) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - Senate - (S) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 65 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - (H) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - Senate - (S) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2017-05-04 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2017-05-01 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2017-04-27 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-12 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2017-04-10 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2017-04-10 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2017-04-07 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2017-04-06 | House | (H) Returned to Senate |
2017-04-06 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2017-04-06 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-04-05 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Appropriations |
2017-04-04 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Appropriations |
2017-04-04 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2017-04-03 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2017-04-03 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2017-04-03 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-03-30 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) State Administration |
2017-03-30 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) State Administration |
2017-03-29 | House | (H) Hearing (H) State Administration |
2017-03-23 | House | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) State Administration |
2017-03-01 | House | (H) First Reading |
2017-03-01 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) State Administration |
2017-02-24 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2017-02-24 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2017-02-24 | Senate | (S) On Motion Rules Suspended |
2017-02-24 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2017-02-24 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-02-23 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-02-23 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Finance and Claims |
2017-02-23 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Finance and Claims |
2017-01-31 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2017-01-31 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2017-01-27 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2017-01-24 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2017-01-23 | Senate | (S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2017-01-23 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2017-01-23 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-01-17 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-01-17 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) State Administration |
2017-01-16 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) State Administration |
2017-01-09 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) State Administration |
2017-01-09 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2017-01-02 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2017-01-02 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2016-12-29 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) State Administration |
2016-12-13 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2016-12-13 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2016-12-13 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2016-12-09 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2016-12-09 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2016-12-09 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2016-12-08 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2016-12-08 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2016-12-08 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2016-12-08 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2016-12-08 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2016-12-07 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2016-12-07 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2016-12-07 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2016-12-07 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2016-10-27 | (C) Draft Request Received |