MT SB45 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-30 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-30 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the renewable portfolio standard laws to include hydro expansions
Title
Revise the renewable portfolio standard laws to include hydro expansions
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Keane [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-20 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 95 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 96 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-23 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 70 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 70 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 96 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-23 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 70 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 70 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-30 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2013-04-30 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2013-04-26 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2013-04-26 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2013-04-25 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2013-04-25 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2013-04-25 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2013-04-25 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-04-25 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2013-04-20 | House | (H) Returned to Senate Concurred in Governor's Proposed Amendments |
2013-04-20 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted |
2013-04-20 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-04-19 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted |
2013-04-19 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-04-19 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House for Consideration of Governor's Proposed Amendments |
2013-04-17 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted |
2013-04-17 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-04-16 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted |
2013-04-16 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-04-12 | Senate | (S) Returned with Governor's Proposed Amendments |
2013-04-04 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2013-04-03 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2013-04-03 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2013-03-26 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2013-03-26 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2013-03-26 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2013-03-25 | House | (H) Returned to Senate |
2013-03-23 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2013-03-23 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-03-22 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2013-03-22 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed |
2013-03-22 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-03-19 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Federal Relations, Energy, and Telecommunications |
2013-03-18 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Federal Relations, Energy, and Telecommunications |
2013-03-11 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Federal Relations, Energy, and Telecommunications |
2013-02-26 | House | (H) First Reading |
2013-02-26 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Federal Relations, Energy, and Telecommunications |
2013-01-30 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2013-01-29 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2013-01-29 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-01-28 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2013-01-28 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed |
2013-01-28 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-01-23 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Energy and Telecommunications |
2013-01-22 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Energy and Telecommunications |
2013-01-15 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Energy and Telecommunications |
2013-01-07 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2012-12-18 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Energy and Telecommunications |
2012-12-11 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2012-12-11 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2012-12-11 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2012-11-13 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2012-09-26 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2012-09-26 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2012-09-26 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2012-09-24 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB] | |
2012-09-24 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2012-09-20 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2012-09-07 | (C) Draft Request Received |