MT SB470 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-13 - (S) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-13 - (S) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Generally revising laws related to bail bonds
Title
Generally revising laws related to bail bonds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-02 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postponed (Y: 44 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Pass Motion Failed (Y: 11 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-28 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Pass Motion Failed (Y: 11 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-28 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-13 | Senate | (S) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal |
2023-03-03 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2023-03-02 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postponed |
2023-03-02 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Pass Motion Failed |
2023-03-02 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2023-02-28 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Judiciary |
2023-02-28 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Judiciary |
2023-02-27 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Signed |
2023-02-27 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2023-02-27 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2023-02-27 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Judiciary |
2023-02-23 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2023-02-23 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary |
2023-02-22 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2023-02-22 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2023-02-21 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2023-02-21 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-02-21 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2023-02-21 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-02-21 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2023-02-20 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2023-02-20 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2023-02-20 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2023-02-20 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2023-02-20 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review | |
2023-02-16 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2023-02-16 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2023-02-16 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2023-02-15 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2023-01-05 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2022-12-18 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2022-12-16 | (C) Draft Request Received |