MT SB58 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - (H) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - (H) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Lengthen time DNA evidence must be preserved in certain cases
Title
Lengthen time DNA evidence must be preserved in certain cases
Sponsors
Sen. Lynda Moss [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-15 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 27 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | (H) Died in Standing Committee | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Judiciary | |
2011-03-09 | (H) Hearing (H) Judiciary | |
2011-03-03 | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary | |
2011-03-03 | (H) First Reading | |
2011-02-15 | (S) Transmitted to House | |
2011-02-15 | (S) 3rd Reading Passed | |
2011-02-15 | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading | |
2011-02-14 | (S) 2nd Reading Passed | |
2011-02-14 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-02-09 | (S) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Printed | |
2011-02-09 | (S) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Signed | |
2011-02-09 | (S) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Received | |
2011-02-09 | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed | |
2011-02-07 | (S) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Requested | |
2011-02-07 | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Received | |
2011-02-04 | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested | |
2011-02-02 | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Judiciary | |
2011-02-02 | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Judiciary | |
2011-01-11 | (S) Hearing (S) Judiciary | |
2011-01-06 | (S) Sponsor List Modified | |
2011-01-05 | (S) Hearing Canceled (S) Judiciary | |
2011-01-05 | (S) Fiscal Note Printed | |
2011-01-05 | (S) Fiscal Note Signed | |
2011-01-04 | (S) Fiscal Note Received | |
2011-01-03 | (S) First Reading | |
2010-12-27 | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary | |
2010-12-15 | (S) Fiscal Note Requested | |
2010-12-13 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2010-12-13 | (S) Introduced | |
2010-12-10 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2010-11-10 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2010-11-08 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2010-11-04 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2010-11-01 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2010-10-28 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2010-10-28 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2010-10-28 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN] | |
2010-09-17 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2010-09-17 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2010-09-14 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2010-09-14 | (C) Draft Request Received |