MT SB97 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-12 - (S) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-12 - (S) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise parental notice of abortion and judicial bypass
Title
Revise parental notice of abortion and judicial bypass
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-26 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 65 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 67 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Not Concurred (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 62 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended (Y: 60 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 65 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 67 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Not Concurred (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 62 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended (Y: 60 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-12 | (S) Died in Process | |
2011-05-12 | (S) Vetoed by Governor | |
2011-05-02 | (S) Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-05-02 | (H) Signed by Speaker | |
2011-05-02 | (S) Signed by President | |
2011-04-26 | (S) Returned from Enrolling | |
2011-04-26 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2011-04-26 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2011-04-26 | (S) Sent to Enrolling | |
2011-04-26 | (S) 3rd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2011-04-26 | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading | |
2011-04-20 | (S) 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2011-04-20 | (H) 3rd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2011-04-20 | (H) 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2011-04-20 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-04-20 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Conference Committee Report Received | |
2011-04-19 | (H) Conference Committee Report Received | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Hearing (S) Conference | |
2011-04-11 | (H) Conference Committee Appointed | |
2011-04-11 | (H) Free Conference Committee Dissolved | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Free Conference Committee Appointed | |
2011-04-05 | (S) Conference Committee Appointed | |
2011-04-05 | (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Not Concurred | |
2011-04-05 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-03-30 | (H) Returned to Senate with Amendments | |
2011-03-30 | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred | |
2011-03-30 | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading | |
2011-03-29 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2011-03-29 | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended | |
2011-03-29 | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried | |
2011-03-29 | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried | |
2011-03-28 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2011-03-28 | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Judiciary | |
2011-03-28 | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Judiciary | |
2011-03-23 | (H) Hearing (H) Judiciary | |
2011-03-03 | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary | |
2011-03-03 | (H) First Reading | |
2011-02-18 | (S) Transmitted to House | |
2011-02-18 | (S) 3rd Reading Passed | |
2011-02-18 | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading | |
2011-02-17 | (S) 2nd Reading Passed | |
2011-02-17 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-02-14 | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Judiciary | |
2011-02-14 | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Judiciary | |
2011-02-11 | (S) Hearing (S) Judiciary | |
2011-01-03 | (S) First Reading | |
2011-01-03 | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary | |
2010-12-29 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2010-12-29 | (S) Introduced | |
2010-12-20 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2010-12-15 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2010-12-15 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2010-12-14 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2010-12-14 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2010-12-14 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2010-12-06 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2010-12-06 | (C) Draft Back for Redo | |
2010-11-15 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2010-11-15 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2010-11-10 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2010-11-09 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2010-11-09 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2010-11-09 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2010-11-03 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2010-10-25 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2010-10-25 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2010-10-20 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2010-05-06 | (C) Draft Request Received |