MT SB99 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - (S) Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - (S) Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise insure Montana small business health insurance laws
Title
Revise insure Montana small business health insurance laws
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-18 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 76 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-17 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 74 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 73 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - House - (H) Business and Labor Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-17 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 74 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 73 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - House - (H) Business and Labor Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-27 | Senate | (S) Vetoed by Governor |
2015-04-25 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2015-04-24 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-22 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2015-04-21 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2015-04-20 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2015-04-20 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-04-20 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2015-04-18 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2015-04-18 | House | (H) Returned to Senate |
2015-04-18 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2015-04-18 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-04-17 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2015-04-17 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-04-16 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-04-15 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-04-15 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Appropriations |
2015-04-15 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Appropriations |
2015-04-13 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2015-03-31 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2015-03-31 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2015-03-31 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-03-27 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-03-27 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Business and Labor |
2015-03-27 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Business and Labor |
2015-03-27 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Business and Labor |
2015-03-24 | House | (H) First Reading |
2015-03-24 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Business and Labor |
2015-03-21 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2015-03-21 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2015-03-21 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-03-20 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2015-03-20 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed |
2015-03-20 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-03-18 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-03-17 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-03-10 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-03-05 | Senate | (S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-02-25 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-02-25 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Signed |
2015-02-25 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2015-02-20 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-02-20 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2015-02-19 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2015-01-23 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2015-01-15 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-01-13 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2015-01-05 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2014-12-18 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2014-12-17 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2014-12-15 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2014-12-15 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2014-12-11 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2014-12-11 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2014-12-11 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2014-12-11 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2014-12-11 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN] | |
2014-12-11 | (C) Draft Back for Redo | |
2014-12-11 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2014-12-11 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2014-12-10 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2014-12-10 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2014-12-09 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN] | |
2014-12-09 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2014-12-09 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2014-11-24 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2014-09-19 | (C) Draft Request Received |