MT SR53 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - (S) Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - (S) Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution to confirm Jonathan Motl as commissioner of political practices
Title
Resolution to confirm Jonathan Motl as commissioner of political practices
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Sesso [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-24 - Senate - (S) Resolution Adopted (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-27 | Senate | (S) Filed with Secretary of State |
2015-04-27 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2015-04-27 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2015-04-27 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2015-04-25 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2015-04-24 | Senate | (S) Resolution Adopted |
2015-04-24 | Senate | (S) Motion Carried (S) State Administration |
2015-04-20 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) State Administration |
2015-04-20 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) State Administration |
2015-04-10 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) State Administration |
2015-04-10 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2015-04-10 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2015-04-10 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2015-04-09 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2015-03-24 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2015-03-24 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2015-03-24 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2015-03-24 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2015-03-24 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2015-03-24 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH] | |
2015-03-24 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2015-03-13 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2015-03-13 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2015-01-21 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2015-01-15 | (C) Draft Request Received |