NC H10 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Repeal 2015 Law Relating to Monuments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeal 2015 Law Relating to Monuments

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-21HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-21HouseSerial Referral To Judiciary Stricken
2019-01-31HouseRef to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-01-31HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-01-30HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S19 (Same As) 2019-02-05 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback