NC H10 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 11:00 am in 544 LOB
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 11:00 am in 544 LOB
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Require Sheriffs to Cooperate with ICE
Title
Require Sheriffs to Cooperate with ICE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-28 - House - A1 Cunningham Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 71 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 71 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2023-03-29 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2023-03-28 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2023-03-28 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-03-28 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-03-28 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2023-03-27 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/28/2023 |
2023-03-27 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-03-21 | House | Re-referred To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-03-21 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2023-03-16 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2023-03-16 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-03-16 | House | Re-referred To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-03-16 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2023-03-09 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2023-03-09 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-03-09 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-03-09 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2023-03-06 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2023-03-06 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-03-06 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-03-06 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2023-02-28 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2023-02-28 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-02-22 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-02-22 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-01-26 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary 2, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-01-26 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-01-25 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgeting
Correctional Institutions
Counties
Criminal Procedure
Dhhs
Government Employees
Immigration
Inspections
Jails
Law Enforcement
Local Government
Personnel
Public
Reporting
Sheriffs
State Employees
Warrants
Budgeting
Correctional Institutions
Counties
Criminal Procedure
Dhhs
Government Employees
Immigration
Inspections
Jails
Law Enforcement
Local Government
Personnel
Public
Reporting
Sheriffs
State Employees
Warrants
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
162 | 62 | (n/a) | Citation Text |