NC H1058 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - Ch. SL 2018-111
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - Ch. SL 2018-111
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Dissolve Airport Commission of Forsyth County
Title
Dissolve Airport Commission of Forsyth County
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-27 | Ch. SL 2018-111 | |
2018-06-27 | Ratified | |
2018-06-26 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-06-26 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-06-26 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2018-06-26 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2018-06-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2018-06-26 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-06-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2018-06-14 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2018-06-13 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-06-13 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2018-06-13 | House | Added to Calendar |
2018-06-13 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2018-06-13 | House | Reptd Fav |
2018-06-01 | House | Ref To Com On State and Local Government II |
2018-06-01 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2018-05-31 | House | Filed |