NC H107 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-10 - Ch. SL 2013-256
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-10 - Ch. SL 2013-256
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Eastern Region/Disbursement of Funds
Title
Eastern Region/Disbursement of Funds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-07-09 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 97 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - House - Third Reading (Y: 87 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - House - A1 Hamilton Third Reading (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - House - Second Reading (Y: 71 N: 39 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - House - Third Reading (Y: 87 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - House - A1 Hamilton Third Reading (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - House - Second Reading (Y: 71 N: 39 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-10 | Ch. SL 2013-256 | |
2013-07-10 | Ratified | |
2013-07-09 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-07-09 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2013-07-08 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/09/2013 |
2013-07-08 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2013-07-03 | House | Rec To Concur S Com Sub |
2013-07-03 | House | Rec From Senate |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Withdrawn From Senate Clerk's Office |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Held in Senate Clerk's Office |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-05-16 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2013-05-16 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-05-16 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2013-05-16 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-05-16 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/16/2013 |
2013-05-16 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-05-16 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-05-14 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2013-05-14 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2013-02-18 | House | Ref to the Com on Government, if favorable, Finance |
2013-02-18 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-02-14 | House | Filed |